Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4256 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17662 Week
» 70678 Month
» 190205 Year
» 3217058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1864 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9063 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49063 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3901 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/08/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1899 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3D |
|
Aston |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/08/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1864 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3901 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9063 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49063 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49063 |
|
|