Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 944 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18747 Week
» 71763 Month
» 191290 Year
» 3218143 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1886 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9390 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
British Railways |
49390 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4160 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/12/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
25G |
|
Farnley Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10B |
|
Preston |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1886 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4160 |
|
|
01/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9390 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49390 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
21/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49390 |
|
|