Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1012 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18815 Week
» 71831 Month
» 191358 Year
» 3218211 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1892 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8902 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
48902 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4186 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/02/1953 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
3B |
|
Bushbury |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
3D |
|
Aston |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
09/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1892 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4186 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8902 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48902 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48902 |
|
|