Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 705 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14111 Week
» 67127 Month
» 186654 Year
» 3213507 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
823 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8904 |
m/e |
03/1928 |
British Railways |
48904 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4237 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1949 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 823 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4237 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8904 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 48904 but not taken up |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8904 |
|
|