Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1741 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15147 Week
» 68163 Month
» 187690 Year
» 3214543 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2563 |
m/e |
08/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9604 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1930) |
8893 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
British Railways |
48893 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4262 |
To Service |
During 08/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 31/10/1954 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 3 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2563 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4262 |
|
|
02/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9604 |
|
|
07/1930 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8893 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48893 |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/10/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48893 |
|
|