Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19840 Week
» 72856 Month
» 192383 Year
» 3219236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1051 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8922 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
48922 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4282 |
To Service |
During 11/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/05/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1051 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4282 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8922 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48922 |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48922 |
|
|