Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1230 |
m/e |
01/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9378 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
British Railways |
49378 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4311 |
To Service |
During 01/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1230 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4311 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9378 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49378 |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49378 |
|
|