Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 632 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19543 Week
» 84497 Month
» 287161 Year
» 3314014 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1273 |
m/e |
05/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9614 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
Class | From | B | 05/1903 | F | 05/1906 |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4326 |
To Service |
During 05/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1928 |
Service Life |
25 yrs , 7 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1903 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1928 |
25E |
|
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1273 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4326 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9614 |
|
|
12/1928 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9614 |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|