Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3472 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16878 Week
» 69894 Month
» 189421 Year
» 3216274 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2118 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9292 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49292 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4355 |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1903 |
15A |
|
Wellingborough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2118 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4355 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9292 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49292 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9292 |
|
|