Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
818 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9132 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49132 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4401 |
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/04/1959 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 818 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4401 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9132 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49132 |
|
|
03/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49132 |
|
|