Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14058 Week
» 67074 Month
» 186601 Year
» 3213454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2387 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9357 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
British Railways |
49357 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4404 |
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Northampton |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2387 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4404 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9357 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49357 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
08/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49357 |
|
|