Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2657 |
m/e |
02/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9080 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
British Railways |
49080 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4894 |
To Service |
During 02/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1950 |
Service Life |
40 yrs |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1910 |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1950 |
8D |
|
Widnes |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
21B |
Bescot |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/05/1959 |
Rugby Works |
On 1st May u/r-42253(14D), 45137(14E), 45269(21A), 49081(5C), 49216(3A). Awaiting works-44819(14D), 73127(26F). |
SLS/195907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2657 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4894 |
|
|
10/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9080 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49080 but not taken up |
|
|
02/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9080 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|