Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3771 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17177 Week
» 70193 Month
» 189720 Year
» 3216573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2661 |
m/e |
02/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9088 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
49088 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4898 |
To Service |
During 02/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/11/1957 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2661 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4898 |
|
|
09/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9088 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49088 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49088 |
|
|