02/11/1943 |
Crewe Works |
Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. |
SLS/194401 |
20/07/1948 |
Crewe Works |
July 20th saw the completion of No. 44747, the last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 469; this was followed by Nos. 41210 and 41211 , the first 2-6-2T's of Order E 470, completed on 29/7 and 4/8 respectively. These engines differ from those of the previous batch in that they are fitted for 'motor train' working. The first two engines are also equipped with a modified cylinder lubricator (mechanical), in which the oil level may be observed through a glass set in one side of the lubricator casting. No. 5525 is the latest 'Patriot' 4-6-0 to be rebuilt, and was completed on 29/7. No. 5527 will follow shortly. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. locomotives continue to be thinned, the following locomotives having gone to the scrap heap since the end of June: W/E 3/7, Nos. 6686, 7740, 28350; W/E 24/7, Nos. 6909, 9103, 9201; W/E 31/7, Nos. 9095 an 28261. In connection with the Centenary of the Chester & Holyhead Rly., Cornwall and Hardwicke were recently dispatched for exhibition at Conway. Three more 4-6-0's have been repainted black with ex L.N.W.R. lining. They are Class '5' No. 44825, Class '5XP' No. 45663 and Class '6P' No. 45529, which was named Stephenson W/E 24/7. Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 44755, the first double chimney Caprotti engine, has been fitted with an indicator cab across the front end for the purpose of obtaining steam distribution data |
SLS/194809 |
27/07/1961 |
Ex-LNWR 0-8-0 in Scotland |
Ex-LNWR 0-8-0 49104 was noted leaving Carstairs on 27th July hauling 72002; it was noted at Polmadie the next day and again on 2nd August at Flemington on a southbound goods. All correspondents aver that this is the first occasion an ex-LNW 0-8-0 has visited Glasgow. |
SLS/196109 |
10/03/1963 |
Preston MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Midland Miscellany (Stored) |
The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey. It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
SLS/196304 |
15/11/1963 |
Crewe Works (cut up) |
Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). |
SLS/196312 |