Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1609 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9112 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
49112 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4922 |
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
80G |
|
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1958 |
Pontypool Road MPD |
58926 is now stored outside (with 49113). |
SLS/195807 |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1609 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4922 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9112 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49112 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49112 |
|
|