Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3648 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17054 Week
» 70070 Month
» 189597 Year
» 3216450 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
434 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9402 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
49402 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 1 mth , 0 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10A |
|
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Preston MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Preston on 10th March-42476/661, 45543/50, 49104/314/81/402/8/38/47/51. |
SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 |
Midland Miscellany (Stored) |
The new Water Orton station junction box-renamed Water Orton East Junction-was brought into use 12th May, 1963. Ketley Junc. was removed 12th May, 1963; it is now only possible to approach Ketley station via Lightmoor Junction. On 12th May, the collapse of Black Bridge (over the course of the old River Nene) at Stanground, Peterborough, closed the Peterborough East-March section and buses are now operating between Peterborough and Whittlesey. It is understood that the Ashbourne-Buxton line will not be available for passenger trains after Sunday, 26th May, when excursions ran from Hinckley to Tissington and Buxton, Alsager to Tissington and Buxton, Colne to Buxton and Ashbourne and Manchester (P) to Buxton and Ashbourne. The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 434 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9402 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49402 |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49402 |
|
|