Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
758 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9442 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
49442 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 10/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1922 |
10B |
|
Preston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2F |
|
Coventry |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
2F |
|
Coventry |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Coventry |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1959 |
Rugby MPD |
For the first time since the middle of the War (when a Princess Royal was allocated) three named engines have been transferred here viz. Patriots 45533/7/41, all unrebuilt; they are being used on freight turns. Stanier 0-4-4Ts 41902/9 stored here since Warwick closed 11/58, were withdrawn w.e. 30th November. (Note that only 41900/4 now remain in stock as 41901/2/3/5/6/7/8/9 were withdrawn also on 30th November). Late items-41904 has now been withdrawn. It is understood that the Patriots have been allocated to assist, when necessary, the new diesels. The engines withdrawn on 28th Nov. were all still on shed on 13th Dec. viz. 40565/653/77/83, 41902/9, 49266/442 . |
SLS/196001 |
20/12/1960 |
Coventry MPD |
40657/83 were taken out of store on 20th Dec. (? transferred to Watford) and 49112 was taken to Rugby on 29th Dec.; engines now left here are 40565/677, 41902/9, 49442, 41214 an 42669. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 758 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9442 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49442 |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2F) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2F) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49442 |
|
|