Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3240 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16646 Week
» 69662 Month
» 189189 Year
» 3216042 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
13 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9450 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
49450 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 10/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 13 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9450 |
|
|
02/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49450 |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49450 |
|
|