Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 320 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18123 Week
» 71139 Month
» 190666 Year
» 3217519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1778 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9160 |
m/e |
09/1926 |
British Railways |
49160 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1778 |
|
|
09/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9160 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49160 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49160 |
|
|