Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2625 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16031 Week
» 69047 Month
» 188574 Year
» 3215427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2301 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9191 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
British Railways |
49191 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2301 |
|
|
11/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9191 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49191 |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49191 |
|
|