Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4777 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20389 Week
» 119034 Month
» 321698 Year
» 3348551 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
326 |
m/e |
01/1913 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9201 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49201 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 01/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/06/1948 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1913 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2F |
|
Coventry |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/06/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2F |
Coventry |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/07/1948 |
Crewe Works |
July 20th saw the completion of No. 44747, the last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 469; this was followed by Nos. 41210 and 41211 , the first 2-6-2T's of Order E 470, completed on 29/7 and 4/8 respectively. These engines differ from those of the previous batch in that they are fitted for 'motor train' working. The first two engines are also equipped with a modified cylinder lubricator (mechanical), in which the oil level may be observed through a glass set in one side of the lubricator casting. No. 5525 is the latest 'Patriot' 4-6-0 to be rebuilt, and was completed on 29/7. No. 5527 will follow shortly. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. locomotives continue to be thinned, the following locomotives having gone to the scrap heap since the end of June: W/E 3/7, Nos. 6686, 7740, 28350; W/E 24/7, Nos. 6909, 9103, 9201; W/E 31/7, Nos. 9095 an 28261. In connection with the Centenary of the Chester & Holyhead Rly., Cornwall and Hardwicke were recently dispatched for exhibition at Conway. Three more 4-6-0's have been repainted black with ex L.N.W.R. lining. They are Class '5' No. 44825, Class '5XP' No. 45663 and Class '6P' No. 45529, which was named Stephenson W/E 24/7. Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 44755, the first double chimney Caprotti engine, has been fitted with an indicator cab across the front end for the purpose of obtaining steam distribution data |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1913 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 326 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9201 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2F) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9201 |
|
|
07/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49201 but not taken up |
|
|