Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1489 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19292 Week
» 72308 Month
» 191835 Year
» 3218688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1127 |
m/e |
07/1913 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9211 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
British Railways |
49211 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1913 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1949 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1913 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1127 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9211 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49211 but not taken up |
|
|
09/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9211 |
|
|