Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15173 Week
» 68189 Month
» 187716 Year
» 3214569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2117 |
m/e |
09/1913 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9219 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
British Railways |
49219 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 09/1913 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/09/1950 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1913 |
6B |
|
Mold Junction |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1913 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2117 |
|
|
07/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9219 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49219 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49219 |
|
|