Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 633 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19544 Week
» 84498 Month
» 287162 Year
» 3314015 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1435 |
m/e |
08/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9316 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
British Railways |
49316 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 08/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Thu 24/01/1957 (At Crewe Works) |
Withdrawal Notes |
At Crewe Works |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
854,022 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
86K |
Tredegar |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1435 |
|
|
01/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9316 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49316 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
24/01/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49316 |
|
|
08/02/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|