Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1785 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9318 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
49318 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 09/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/11/1957 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1785 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9318 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49318 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49318 |
|
|