Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2236 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9322 |
m/e |
10/1923 |
British Railways |
49322 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 09/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/03/1956 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2236 |
|
|
10/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9322 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49322 |
|
|
10/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
10/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49322 |
|
|