Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3125 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16531 Week
» 69547 Month
» 189074 Year
» 3215927 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2497 |
m/e |
12/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9334 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49334 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 12/1918 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1950 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1918 |
1A |
|
Willesden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/08/1947 |
Roade Station |
On 7/8, at 5 p.m., No. 9083 coupled to No. 9334 was noted at the north end of the station, with its tender and rear pair of coupled wheels derailed, thus blocking the up fast line to Euston. No. 4910(2A) was sent from Rugby with the breakdown crane. |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2497 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9334 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49334 but not taken up |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9334 |
|
|