Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4205 |
m/e |
02/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7245 |
on |
11/05/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2449 |
To Service |
During 02/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1964 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
4w/e |
24/02/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
REINS |
88B |
Radyr |
3w/e |
05/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4205 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2449 |
|
|
11/05/1938 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7245 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7245 |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|