Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3639 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17045 Week
» 70061 Month
» 189588 Year
» 3216441 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4215 |
m/e |
09/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2459 |
To Service |
During 09/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 01/10/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LA |
Laira |
4w/e |
01/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
86H |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
ALLOC |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4215 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2459 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Blazey (SBZ) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
01/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4215 |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|