|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. | SLS/196106 |
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4216 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2460 |
||
04/03/1938 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7244 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Llanelli (LLY) | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
31/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
31/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
27/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
09/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
19/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
17/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7244 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |