Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17832 Week
» 70848 Month
» 190375 Year
» 3217228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4220 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7241 |
on |
14/09/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
187 |
Works Number |
2464 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/11/1962 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4220 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2464 |
|
|
14/09/1937 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7241 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
26/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7241 |
|
|
12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|