Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43065 |
on |
24/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 24/11/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/01/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
35A |
New England |
on |
24/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43065 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
10/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43065 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|