Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3263 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16669 Week
» 69685 Month
» 189212 Year
» 3216065 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43066 |
on |
01/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sat 01/12/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/01/1967 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Stratford Works |
The latest LMR Class 4 Moguls to be repaired here are 43066 (35A) and 43148/51/2 (32G). |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43066 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43066 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|