Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 550 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19461 Week
» 84415 Month
» 287079 Year
» 3313932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43082 |
on |
03/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sun 03/11/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/11/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/11/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43082 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
14/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43082 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|