|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Stored) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43101 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
12/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
13/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
04/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
12/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
06/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43101 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |