|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Stripping Sp.) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
30/04/1961 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. | SLS/196106 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/03/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43105 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) | ||
07/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
10/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43105 | ||
11/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |