Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46447 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 16 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1950
12D   Workington w/e 27/05/1950
12D   Workington 2w/e 17/06/1950
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/12/1959
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 18/06/1960
6H   Bangor w/e 17/09/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/09/1961
17A   Derby w/e 25/05/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 27/05/1950
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46447
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46447    

prev prev