Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15507 |
on |
12/04/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
8 |
on |
01/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40008 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/04/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/11/1959 off Llandudno Junction (6G) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 28/02/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/08/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
03/12/1949 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/04/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15507 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8 |
|
|
02/08/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40008 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40008 from Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
28/02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|