Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3608 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13182 Week
» 78136 Month
» 280800 Year
» 3307653 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15508 |
on |
23/04/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
9 |
on |
01/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40009 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/04/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/05/1962 off Heaton Mersey (9F) |
Service Life |
32 yrs , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/05/1934 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
06/09/1947 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15508 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9 |
|
|
04/05/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
06/09/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40009 |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40009 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|