30/04/1947 |
Watford Area |
Watford, having lost all the ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-2T's viz: Nos. 6869, 6871, and 6909, their miscellaneous duties are now performed by the three 2-6-2T's Nos. 10, 20, and 43. The latter have consequently been taken off their regular work on the St. Albans branch, which is now in the hands of 2-4-2T's Nos. 6686, 6725 and 6729. These are the only Webb engines still left in the London area. The Stanmore branch is operated-by the two 0-4-4T's Nos. 1908 and 1909. The two Jinty's (Nos. 7327 and 7359) which were recently at Watford for several months, have now returned to Willesden. Apart from the still numerous 0-8-0's ex L.N.W.R. engines are now extremely rare on the old L.N.W.R. main line. The last 'Claughton' No. 6004 has made two appearances in London, on 3rd February and again on 18th March. The 'Princes' at Bletchley work mainly on the Oxford and Cambridge branches and seldom come to London since their last regular turn, the 6.35 a.m. ex Bletchley returning with 5.25 p.m. ex Euston, was turned over to a class 5 working at the end of last year. The poor old 'Princes' in their present deplorable state of maintenance could not keep time with the somewhat smartly timed 5.25 p.m., invariably losing anything from 5 to 20 minutes, according to the particular engine and the enthusiasm-or lack of it-of the driver. As a regular traveller by this train one cannot really regret their replacement, apart from the sentimental aspect. |
SLS/194706 |
31/12/1949 |
Derby Works |
Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12. Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December. |
SLS/195002 |
03/07/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) |
Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. |
SLS/195807 |
28/07/1958 |
Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) |
28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. |
SLS/195808 |
29/08/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. |
SLS/195809 |
22/04/1961 |
Nuneaton MPD |
One of Nuneaton's two Fowler 2-6-2Ts, 40051, was withdrawn on 22nd April-the other, 40010, continues on shed pilot duties. Patriot 45533 has survived a visit to Crewe Works and is working relief passenger trains and Willesden goods. |
SLS/196106 |