Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4162 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17568 Week
» 70584 Month
» 190111 Year
» 3216964 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15515 |
on |
17/11/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
16 |
on |
10/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40016 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 17/11/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/07/1961 off Carnforth (24L) |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11E |
Tebay |
m/e |
31/01/1946 |
ALLOC |
11E |
Tebay |
5w/e |
02/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Warwick |
w/e |
07/10/1950 |
LOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
24L |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
27/08/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
31/07/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15515 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
31/07/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
10/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 16 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40016 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40016 from Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|