|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/06/1958 | Derby Works (Yard) | Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. | SLS/195806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/11/1930 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15516 Built at Derby Works |
||
10/03/1933 | Modification | Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels | ||
10/05/1934 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 17 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warwick (2E) | ||
19/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40017 | ||
08/10/1949 | Modification | Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warwick (2C) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
01/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F) | ||
07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 40017 from Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
10/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |