Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 897 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14303 Week
» 67319 Month
» 186846 Year
» 3213699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15517 |
on |
01/12/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
18 |
on |
10/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40018 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 01/12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/07/1961 off Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/09/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
23/02/1952 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15517 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/09/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
10/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 18 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40018 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40018 from Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|