Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2009 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19812 Week
» 72828 Month
» 192355 Year
» 3219208 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15519 |
on |
15/12/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
20 |
on |
10/05/1934 |
British Railways |
40020 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 15/12/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/07/1961 off Bedford (14E) |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2C |
Warwick |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
EXLOAN |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
LOAN |
14E |
Bedford |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
LOAN |
14B |
Kentish Town |
5w/e |
31/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
14B |
Kentish Town |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
14E |
Bedford |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
26/07/1933 |
Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
13/06/1953 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1947 |
Watford Area |
Watford, having lost all the ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-2T's viz: Nos. 6869, 6871, and 6909, their miscellaneous duties are now performed by the three 2-6-2T's Nos. 10, 20, and 43. The latter have consequently been taken off their regular work on the St. Albans branch, which is now in the hands of 2-4-2T's Nos. 6686, 6725 and 6729. These are the only Webb engines still left in the London area. The Stanmore branch is operated-by the two 0-4-4T's Nos. 1908 and 1909. The two Jinty's (Nos. 7327 and 7359) which were recently at Watford for several months, have now returned to Willesden. Apart from the still numerous 0-8-0's ex L.N.W.R. engines are now extremely rare on the old L.N.W.R. main line. The last 'Claughton' No. 6004 has made two appearances in London, on 3rd February and again on 18th March. The 'Princes' at Bletchley work mainly on the Oxford and Cambridge branches and seldom come to London since their last regular turn, the 6.35 a.m. ex Bletchley returning with 5.25 p.m. ex Euston, was turned over to a class 5 working at the end of last year. The poor old 'Princes' in their present deplorable state of maintenance could not keep time with the somewhat smartly timed 5.25 p.m., invariably losing anything from 5 to 20 minutes, according to the particular engine and the enthusiasm-or lack of it-of the driver. As a regular traveller by this train one cannot really regret their replacement, apart from the sentimental aspect. |
SLS/194706 |
28/02/1962 |
Bedford MPD (Withdrawn) |
With closing of Northampton branch this shed has only one steam passenger turn (8.21 a.m. to Kettering); its only Class 5 (45238) is rostered to the pick-up goods to Northampton and back and then stand-by engine on shed. Withdrawn engines still here are 40020/53 an 43474. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/12/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 15519 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
26/07/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Brakes removed from leading and trailing wheels |
|
|
10/05/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40020 |
|
|
13/06/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40020 from Bedford (14E) |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|