Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4182 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17588 Week
» 70604 Month
» 190131 Year
» 3216984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
84 |
on |
02/04/1935 |
British Railways |
40084 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 02/04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/11/1959 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 84 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40084 |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40084 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|