Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4061 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17467 Week
» 70483 Month
» 190010 Year
» 3216863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
86 |
on |
08/04/1935 |
British Railways |
40086 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 08/04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1960 |
Wrexham G.C. |
After closure on 4th January, 1610, 3749/60, 4683, 5606/51, 6610, 8734 an 9610 were transferred to Croes Newydd, whilst 40085/110/26/205 are stored at latter shed. 40086, 82000/31 went to Machynlleth. |
SLS/196003 |
03/06/1961 |
Chester MPD |
As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 86 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40086 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
23/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40086 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|