Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2275 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20078 Week
» 73094 Month
» 192621 Year
» 3219474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
90 |
on |
20/04/1935 |
British Railways |
40090 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/07/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 90 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40090 |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40090 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|