Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15029 Week
» 68045 Month
» 187572 Year
» 3214425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
92 |
on |
16/05/1935 |
British Railways |
40092 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 16/05/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 20/05/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 92 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40092 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
04/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40092 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|