|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1935 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 122 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) | ||
09/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40122 | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
09/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) | ||
21/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
11/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
20/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warwick (2C) | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
14/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
09/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford (5C) | ||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
28/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Widnes (8D) | ||
16/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
23/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 40122 | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |