Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14144 Week
» 67160 Month
» 186687 Year
» 3213540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
127 |
on |
13/09/1935 |
British Railways |
40127 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 13/09/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/11/1959 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
13/09/1935 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
8E |
|
Brunswick |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
8E |
|
Brunswick |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
LOAN |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/09/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 127 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40127 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
14/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40127 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|